Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Jean Marie Joseph Gueneley

Bishop Emeritus of Langres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1938 Born
29 Jun 196425.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 199961.1AppointedBishop of Langres, France
5 Mar 200061.3Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France
21 Jan 201475.1RetiredBishop of Langres, France
12 May 201475.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
3 Jul 201576.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France

MicroData Summary for Philippe Jean Marie Joseph Gueneley
Bishop Philippe Jean Marie Joseph Gueneley (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Langres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDole

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Langres.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,711
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Jan 2014
  • ab: CB, 12 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast