Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis Henri Maurice Papin

Bishop of Nancy (-Toul), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1947 Born
22 Jun 197426.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 Sep 199951.9AppointedBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France
24 Oct 199952.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nancy (-Toul), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis Henri Maurice Papin
Bishop Jean-Louis Henri Maurice Papin (born ) Bishop of Nancy (-Toul)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChemillé

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nancy (-Toul).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,642

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast