Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leone Giacomo Ossola, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Novara, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1887Born
28 Oct 190922.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Sep 193750.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Harar, Ethiopia
22 Sep 193750.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Salona
17 Oct 193750.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Salona
19 Oct 194356.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Novara, Italy
9 Sep 194558.3AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
11 Jun 195164.0ResignedBishop of Novara, Italy
11 Jun 195164.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria
17 Oct 195164.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Leone Giacomo Ossola (VIAF: 42769983)
Archbishop Leone Giacomo Ossola O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVallo di Caluso

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 63
  • 2h38: CB, 16 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 16 Oct 2018

Quantcast