Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sylvester Patrick Mulligan, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Delhi and Simla

Titular Archbishop of Cyrrhus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1875BornTasson, Ireland
21 Sep 190126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
13 Apr 193762.1AppointedArchbishop of Delhi and Simla, India
23 May 193762.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Delhi and Simla, India
16 Aug 195075.4RetiredArchbishop of Delhi and Simla, India
16 Aug 195075.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus
23 Oct 195075.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Delhi and Simla, India

MicroData Summary for Sylvester Patrick Mulligan:
Archbishop Sylvester Patrick Mulligan O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Delhi and Simla

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013