Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabien-Zoël Decelles

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1870Born
4 Aug 189525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
24 Mar 192453.8AppointedBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
22 May 192454.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada
27 Nov 194272.5DiedBishop of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Fabien-Zoël Decelles (VIAF: 317273238)
Bishop Fabien-Zoël Decelles (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Hyacinthe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Damase
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec
Death PlaceSaint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Hyacinthe, Diocese of Saint-Hyacinthe, Québec

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 32
  • c1: CB, 18 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast