Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lazzaro Opizio Cardinal Pallavicini

Deceased

Secretary of State

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1719Born
10 Mar 175434.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Mar 175434.3Ordained PriestPriest
1 Apr 175434.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
7 Apr 175434.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Naupactus
22 Apr 175434.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
Dec 1759³40.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
31 Jan 176040.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
26 Sep 176646.9Elevated to Cardinal
Jul 1767³47.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
20 Jun 176848.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
19 May 176949.5AppointedSecretary of State
14 Dec 177859.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
23 Feb 178565.3DiedSecretary of State

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lazzaro Opizio Pallavicini (VIAF: 89088805)
Lazzaro Opizio Cardinal Pallavicini (born , died ) Secretary of State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenoa, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Teresa, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Nicola da Tolentino, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
  • a cardinal for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Sep 1766
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 12
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 254

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast