Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Onofrio Maria Ginnari

Deceased

Bishop of Montemarano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1730BornMaratea
16 Jun 175323.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 177444.4AppointedBishop of Montemarano, Italy
3 Jul 177444.5Ordained BishopBishop of Montemarano, Italy
5 Nov 180575.8DiedBishop of Montemarano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Onofrio Maria Ginnari:
Bishop Onofrio Maria Ginnari (born , died ) Bishop of Montemarano

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 295
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Dec 2015