Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel a S. Alberto (Bruno) Baillet (Ballyet), O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Baghdad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1702BornBisuntin
26 Nov 174240.0AppointedBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
22 Dec 174341.1Ordained BishopBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
4 Apr 177370.4DiedBishop of Baghdad, Iraq

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel a S. Alberto (Bruno) Baillet (Ballyet):
Bishop Emmanuel a S. Alberto (Bruno) Baillet (Ballyet) O.C.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Baghdad

  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 112
  • ob/c2: CB, 4 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013