Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Antonio Farao

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1728³BornCuccaro
23 Dec 175224.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 177547.0AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
26 Nov 177547.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
1794¹65.1DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Antonio Farao:
Bishop Giuseppe Antonio Farao (born , died 1794) Bishop of San Severo

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 378
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015