Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Maria Clavarini, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ventimiglia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1720Born
19 May 174322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Mar 177554.7AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
26 Mar 177554.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
1 Oct 179777.3DiedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Maria Clavarini
Bishop Domenico Maria Clavarini O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Ventimiglia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 437
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast