Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Torres, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1727Born
4 Jul 174316.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
23 May 175022.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Jun 177345.9AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
20 Jun 177345.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
29 Oct 177952.3DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Torres
Bishop Antonio de Torres O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucera

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,775
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,773, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 388

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast