Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Garimberti

Deceased

Bishop of Borgo San Donnino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1736BornParma
16 May 176124.6Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 177639.3AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
4 Feb 177639.3Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
2 Apr 181376.5DiedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Garimberti:
Bishop Alessandro Garimberti (born , died ) Bishop of Borgo San Donnino

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 135
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016