Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Herbé Seijas

Deceased

Bishop of San José de Mayo, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1930Born
10 Oct 195626.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 197545.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San José de Mayo, Uruguay
2 Jul 197545.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Mauretania
17 Aug 197545.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Mauretania
15 Oct 197545.6AppointedBishop of San José de Mayo, Uruguay
21 Dec 197545.7InstalledBishop of San José de Mayo, Uruguay
3 May 198353.1DiedBishop of San José de Mayo, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Herbé Seijas
Bishop Herbé Seijas (born , died ) Bishop of San José de Mayo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontevideo
Ordained BishopSan José de Mayo, Diocese of San José de Mayo

  • a priest for 26.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 32, Number 1,839

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast