Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Intini

Bishop of Tricarico, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1965 Born
29 Jun 199024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Conversano-Monopoli, Italy
7 Dec 201650.9AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
22 Feb 201751.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
18 Mar 201751.2InstalledBishop of Tricarico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Intini
Bishop Giovanni Intini (born ) Bishop of Tricarico

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGioia del Colle, Diocese of Conversano-Monopoli
Ordained BishopPalazzetto San Giacomo, Conversano, Diocese of Conversano-Monopoli

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tricarico.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2016
  • ob: CB, 15 Dec 2016
  • c2+: CB, 27 Jan 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast