Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Sunyani

Dioecesis Sunyaniensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Matthew Kwasi Gyamfi, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 1 March 1973
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kumasi
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Ghana
  • Square Kilometers: 19,500 (7,531 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://cdsunyani.net/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 450, Sunyani, Ghana
  • Telephone: (035)20.27.379
  • Fax: 20.27.093

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
1 March 1973ErectedDiocese of Kumasi Diocese of Sunyani (erected)
3 March 1995Territory LostDiocese of Kumasi
Diocese of Sunyani
Diocese of Konongo-Mampong (erected)
24 October 1997Territory LostDiocese of Sunyani Diocese of Goaso (erected)
17 January 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Sunyani (from Cape Coast)
28 December 2007Territory LostDiocese of Konongo-Mampong
Diocese of Sunyani
Diocese of Techiman (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1980119,635950,00012.6%727343,518303413ap1981
1990165,7771,268,00013.1%2820483,453278020ap1991
1999135,2031,600,0008.5%4416602,253256022ap2000
2000144,9051,603,0009.0%4112532,734246222ap2001
2001156,4811,603,0009.8%4411552,845195522ap2002
2002144,9051,609,0009.0%5112632,300135924ap2003
2003175,6241,987,0008.8%5913722,439235427ap2004
2004177,3811,995,8938.9%4614602,956235931ap2005
2007122,584737,65716.6%569651,88575427bul:28Dec08
2010160,050926,64717.3%4211533,019466933ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013