Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Owen Jackels

Archbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1954 Born
30 May 198127.1Ordained PriestPriest of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
28 Jan 200550.7AppointedBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
4 Apr 200550.9Ordained BishopBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
8 Apr 201358.9AppointedArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
30 May 201359.1InstalledArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Owen Jackels
Archbishop Michael Owen Jackels (born ) Archbishop of Dubuque

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRapid City, SD

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Dubuque.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 179, Number 14,848
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jun 2017