Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Alanis Nevares

Auxiliary Bishop of Phoenix, Arizona, USA

Titular Bishop of Natchesium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1954 Born
4 Jul 197723.3ProfessedMember of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
18 Jul 198127.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Our Lady of La Salette
27 May 200753.2IncardinatedPriest of Tyler, Texas, USA
11 May 201056.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Phoenix, Arizona, USA
11 May 201056.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Natchesium
19 Jul 201056.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Natchesium

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Alanis Nevares
Bishop Eduardo Alanis Nevares (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Phoenix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Antonio, TX

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Phoenix.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,762

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast