Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugene John Gerber

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wichita, Kansas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1931Born
19 May 195928.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wichita, Kansas, USA
16 Oct 197645.4AppointedBishop of Dodge City, Kansas, USA
14 Dec 197645.6Ordained BishopBishop of Dodge City, Kansas, USA
17 Nov 198251.5AppointedBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
9 Feb 198351.7InstalledBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
4 Oct 200170.4ResignedBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
29 Sep 201887.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Wichita, Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Eugene John Gerber
Bishop Eugene John Gerber (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wichita

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKingman County, Diocese of Wichita, Kansas
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Wichita, Diocese of Wichita, Kansas
Death PlaceVia Christi-St. Francis, Hospital, Wichita, Diocese of Wichita, Kansas

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 29 Sep 2018
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,976, Number 128
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast