Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward John O’Dea

Deceased

Bishop of Seattle, Washington, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1856Born
23 Dec 188226.0Ordained PriestPriest of Oregon City, Oregon, USA
13 Jun 189639.5AppointedBishop of Nesqually, Washington, USA
8 Sep 189639.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nesqually, Washington, USA
11 Sep 190750.8AppointedBishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
25 Dec 193276.0DiedBishop of Seattle, Washington, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward John O’Dea (VIAF: 303484930)
Bishop Edward John O’Dea (born , died ) Bishop of Seattle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDorchester, MA
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vancouver, Diocese of Vancouver Island
Death PlaceSeattle, Diocese of Seattle, Washington

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 410
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017