Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Francis McGrath

Deceased

Bishop of Baker City, Oregon, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1871Born
21 Dec 189524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
21 Dec 191847.8AppointedBishop of Baker City, Oregon, USA
25 Mar 191948.0Ordained BishopBishop of Baker City, Oregon, USA
12 Apr 195079.1DiedBishop of Baker City, Oregon, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Francis McGrath
Bishop Joseph Francis McGrath (born , died ) Bishop of Baker City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilmacow, Ireland

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,919, Number 16
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast