Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse Joseph Glorieux

Deceased

Bishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1844Born
17 Aug 186723.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 188541.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Idaho, USA
3 Mar 188541.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
19 Apr 188541.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonia
26 Aug 189349.5AppointedBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA
25 Aug 191773.5DiedBishop of Boise City, Idaho, USA

MicroData Summary for Alphonse Joseph Glorieux
Bishop Alphonse Joseph Glorieux (born , died ) Bishop of Boise City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDottingies, Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Death PlacePortland, OR, Archdiocese of Oregon City, Oregon

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 111, and Page 599
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017