Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alvaro Corrada del Rio, S.J.

Bishop Emeritus of Mayagüez, Puerto Rico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1942 Born
1962²19.6ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
6 Jul 197432.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
31 May 198543.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
31 May 198543.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusticiana
4 Aug 198543.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusticiana
5 Jul 199755.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Caguas, Puerto Rico
5 Dec 200058.5AppointedBishop of Tyler, Texas, USA
30 Jan 200158.7InstalledBishop of Tyler, Texas, USA
6 Jul 201169.1AppointedBishop of Mayagüez, Puerto Rico
6 Jul 201169.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tyler, Texas, USA
12 Sep 201169.3InstalledBishop of Mayagüez, Puerto Rico
28 Nov 201270.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Tyler, Texas, USA
9 May 202077.9RetiredBishop of Mayagüez, Puerto Rico

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alvaro Corrada del Rio
Bishop Alvaro Corrada del Rio S.J. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mayagüez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanturce
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Shrine, Washington, D.C., Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mayagüez.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 9 May 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,839

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast