Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Umuahia

Dioecesis Umuahiana



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 23 June 1958
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Owerri
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 2,460 (950 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://umuahiadiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, 57 Azikiwe Road, P.O. Box 99, Umuahia, Abia State, Nigeria

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
23 June 1958ErectedDiocese of Owerri Diocese of Umuahia (erected)
24 January 1981Territory LostDiocese of Umuahia Diocese of Okigwe (erected)
2 April 1990Territory LostDiocese of Umuahia Diocese of Aba (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1969327,0321938575,737623527ap1971
1980530,0992,376,00022.3%61618,690507241ap1981
1990319,7421,868,00017.1%5710674,772767945ap1991
1999110,000884,20912.4%93121051,047169533ap2000
2000115,000884,20913.0%648721,597128533ap2001
2001120,100884,20913.6%7110811,4821414740ap2002
2002122,000884,20913.8%7310831,4691415042ap2003
2003198,861884,20922.5%7712892,2347213344ap2004
2004199,000884,20922.5%8413972,0518114544ap2005
2010220,8681,043,44121.2%121101311,6868013660ap2011
2014220,0001,151,00019.1%125201451,5178515067ap2015
2017241,2331,234,47019.5%151201711,4106615170ap2018

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.6, 14 Jan 2019; Data: 17 Feb 2019

Quantcast