Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anthony John Valentine Obinna

Archbishop of Owerri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1946 BornEmekuku
9 Apr 197225.8Ordained PriestPriest of Owerri, Nigeria
1 Jul 199347.0AppointedBishop of Owerri, Nigeria
4 Sep 199347.2Ordained BishopBishop of Owerri, Nigeria
26 Mar 199447.8AppointedArchbishop of Owerri, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Anthony John Valentine Obinna:
Archbishop Anthony John Valentine Obinna (born ) Archbishop of Owerri

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Owerri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013