Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Javier Torres Aliaga

Bishop of Rafaela, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1960 Born
6 Dec 198423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba, Argentina
16 Nov 201352.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba, Argentina
16 Nov 201352.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum in Numidia
27 Dec 201352.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum in Numidia
11 Nov 202261.8AppointedBishop of Rafaela, Argentina
20 Dec 202261.9InstalledBishop of Rafaela, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Pedro Javier Torres Aliaga
(WikiData: Q15188517)
Bishop Pedro Javier Torres Aliaga (born ) Bishop of Rafaela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba, Archdiocese of Córdoba
Ordained BishopCathedral, Córdoba, Archdiocese of Córdoba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rafaela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2013
  • ob: CB, 16 Nov 2013
  • c2+: CB, 12 Dec 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2,013, Number 167
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 18,000
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2022
  • i: CB, 22 Nov 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024