Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo Orlando Seirutti García

Auxiliary Bishop of Córdoba

Titular Bishop of Bela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1956 BornBuenos Aires
6 Oct 198832.1Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba, Argentina
7 Nov 201559.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba, Argentina
7 Nov 201559.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bela
18 Dec 201559.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bela

MicroData Summary for Ricardo Orlando Seirutti García
Bishop Ricardo Orlando Seirutti García (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Córdoba

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Córdoba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2015
  • c1/ob: CB, 7 Nov 2015
  • c2: CB, 11 Nov 2015
  • c34: CB, 4 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,691

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Feb 2016