Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Roberto Pio Álvarez

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1968 Born
14 Dec 199830.6Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba, Argentina
28 Nov 201749.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Comodoro Rivadavia, Argentina
28 Nov 201749.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto
22 Dec 201749.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto

MicroData Summary for Roberto Pio Álvarez
Father Roberto Pio Álvarez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Comodoro Rivadavia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba, Archdiocese of Córdoba
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de la Asunción, Cathedral, Córdoba, Archdiocese of Córdoba

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Comodoro Rivadavia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2017
  • mn: CB, 28 Nov 2017
  • ob: CB, 28 Nov 2017
  • c2+: CB, 5 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 5 Dec 2017