Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulo Cardoso da Silva, O. Carm.

Bishop Emeritus of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1934 Born
11 Dec 196026.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
30 Nov 198450.1AppointedBishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil
19 Mar 198550.4Ordained BishopBishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil
27 Jul 201176.7RetiredBishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Paulo Cardoso da Silva
Bishop Paulo Cardoso da Silva O. Carm. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Petrolina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaruaru

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Petrolina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jan 2017