Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Assis Gabriel dos Santos, C.SS.R.

Bishop of Campo Maior, Piaui, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1968 Born
11 Feb 199628.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Jul 200032.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
21 Jun 201749.3AppointedBishop of Campo Maior, Piaui, Brazil
26 Aug 201749.5Ordained BishopBishop of Campo Maior, Piaui, Brazil
30 Sep 201749.6InstalledBishop of Campo Maior, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Assis Gabriel dos Santos
Bishop Francisco de Assis Gabriel dos Santos C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop of Campo Maior

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEsperança, Diocese of Campina Grande, Paraiba
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora do Perpetuo Socorro, Church, Garanhuns, Diocese of Garanhuns, Pernambuco

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Campo Maior.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Jun 2017
  • ob: CB, 22 Jun 2017
  • i: CB, 30 Jun 2017
  • c2+/i: CB, 21 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Aug 2017