Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Henry Mueggenborg

Bishop of Reno, Nevada, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1962 Born
6 Apr 198926.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA
14 Jul 198927.2Ordained PriestPriest of Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA
6 Apr 201754.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Seattle, Washington, USA
6 Apr 201754.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tullia
31 May 201755.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tullia
20 Jul 202159.2AppointedBishop of Reno, Nevada, USA
24 Sep 202159.4InstalledBishop of Reno, Nevada, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel Henry Mueggenborg
Bishop Daniel Henry Mueggenborg (born ) Bishop of Reno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOkarche, Archdiocese of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma
Ordained DeaconSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. James, Cathedral, Seattle, Archdiocese of Seattle, Washington

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Reno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Apr 2017
  • ob: CB, 6 Apr 2017
  • c2+: CB, 24 Apr 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,436
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Jul 2021
  • od/c01: AM, 24 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Aug 2021

Quantcast