Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eusebius Joseph Beltran

Archbishop Emeritus of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1934 BornAshley, PA
14 May 196025.7Ordained PriestPriest of Atlanta, Georgia, USA
17 Feb 197843.5AppointedBishop of Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA
20 Apr 197843.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tulsa, Oklahoma, USA
24 Nov 199258.2AppointedArchbishop of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma, USA
22 Jan 199358.4InstalledArchbishop of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma, USA
16 Dec 201076.3RetiredArchbishop of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma, USA

MicroData Summary for Eusebius Joseph Beltran:
Archbishop Eusebius Joseph Beltran (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Oklahoma City

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Oklahoma City.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Dec 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013