Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Oklahoma City

Archidioecesis Oklahomapolitana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Paul Stagg Coakley, Archbishop
  • Eusebius Joseph Beltran, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Indian Territory
14 May 1876ErectedDiocese of Little Rock Prefecture Apostolic of Indian Territory (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Indian Territory
29 May 1891ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Indian Territory Vicariate Apostolic of Indian Territory
Diocese of Oklahoma
23 August 1905ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Indian Territory Diocese of Oklahoma (erected)
Diocese of Oklahoma City and Tulsa
14 November 1930Name ChangedDiocese of Oklahoma Diocese of Oklahoma City and Tulsa
Archdiocese of Oklahoma City
13 December 1972ElevatedDiocese of Oklahoma City and Tulsa Archdiocese of Oklahoma City (Split and Diocese raised to an Archdiocese)
Diocese of Tulsa (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Oklahoma City and Tulsa
195074,0372,750,0002.7%10893201368111714176ap1951
1966109,2342,328,2844.7%20676282387102668202ap1967
1970114,6272,500,3124.6%17973252454105630125ap1971
Archdiocese of Oklahoma City
197667,0631,451,9144.6%1063914546262268120ap1977
198067,0931,624,9004.1%103381414751683278110ap1981
199079,7971,881,2004.2%9434128623425018271ap1991
199992,3912,029,1004.6%9631127727601015372ap2000
200099,7012,217,3744.5%9924123810603615872ap2001
200198,2252,224,0004.4%10524129761633715471ap2002
2002103,2132,268,4804.5%10624130793603614272ap2003
2003103,2372,271,1294.5%10928137753764113871ap2004
2004103,9882,403,2804.3%10228130799754113871ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 6 May 2013