Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugénio Salessu

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Malanje


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1923BornNunda
14 Jul 195733.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 197753.4AppointedBishop of Malanje, Angola
6 Mar 197753.5Ordained BishopBishop of Malanje, Angola
27 Aug 199875.0RetiredBishop of Malanje, Angola
20 Jan 201187.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Malanje, Angola

MicroData Summary for Eugénio Salessu:
Bishop Eugénio Salessu (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Malanje

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 4 Apr 2015