Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pompeu de Sá Leão y Seabra, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop of Malanje


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1908BornSobreira-Paredes
4 Oct 193123.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
20 Dec 196254.9AppointedBishop of Malanje, Angola
10 Mar 196355.1Ordained BishopBishop of Malanje, Angola
7 Apr 197365.2DiedBishop of Malanje, Angola

MicroData Summary for Pompeu de Sá Leão y Seabra:
Bishop Pompeu de Sá Leão y Seabra C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop of Malanje

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013