Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alban Goodier, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bombay, India

Titular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1869Born
20 Sep 190334.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Dec 191950.6AppointedArchbishop of Bombay, India
22 Dec 191950.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bombay, India
1 Oct 192657.4ResignedArchbishop of Bombay, India
1 Oct 192657.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
13 Mar 193969.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bombay, India

MicroData Summary for Alban Goodier (VIAF: 79512575)
Archbishop Alban Goodier S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bombay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGreat Harwood, Great Britain

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,919, Number 74
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 89
  • op: CB, 23 Feb 2016
  • op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast