Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh Singleton

Deceased

Bishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1851Born
25 Jul 188028.9Ordained PriestPriest of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
1 Aug 190857.0AppointedBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
21 Sep 190857.1Ordained BishopBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain
17 Dec 193483.3DiedBishop of Shrewsbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Hugh Singleton
Bishop Hugh Singleton (born , died ) Bishop of Shrewsbury

EventPlace
Birth Place1 Watson Street, Birkenhead, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Ordained PriestOur Lady, Church, Birkenhead, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady and St. Joseph, Church, Seacombe, Wallasey, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Death PlaceBishop's House, 39 Beresford Road, Birkenhead, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England
Buried Place (Original)Flaybrick, Cemetery, Birkenhead, Cheshire, Diocese of Shrewsbury, England

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 54
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 182
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 217 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast