Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Joseph Drury

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Corpus Christi, Texas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1908BornBallynote, Ireland
2 Jun 193527.4Ordained PriestPriest of Amarillo, Texas, USA
30 Oct 196153.8AppointedBishop of San Angelo, Texas, USA
24 Jan 196254.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Angelo, Texas, USA
19 Jul 196557.5AppointedBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
19 May 198375.4RetiredBishop of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA
22 Jul 199284.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Corpus Christi, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Drury:
Bishop Thomas Joseph Drury (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Corpus Christi

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013