Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugène-Stanislas Le Senne

Deceased

Bishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1866BornSaint-Pierre-Quiberon
20 Dec 189024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Vannes, France
1 Jun 191548.7AppointedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
10 Aug 191548.9Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
2 Sep 191548.9InstalledBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
14 Mar 193770.5DiedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France

MicroData Summary for Eugène-Stanislas Le Senne:
Bishop Eugène-Stanislas Le Senne (born , died ) Bishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 48
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013