Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rudolph Aloysius Gerken

Deceased

Archbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1887BornDyersville, IA
10 Jun 191730.2Ordained PriestPriest of Dallas, Texas, USA
25 Aug 192639.4AppointedBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
26 Apr 192740.1Ordained BishopBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
28 Apr 192740.1InstalledBishop of Amarillo, Texas, USA
2 Jun 193346.2AppointedArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA
2 Mar 194355.9DiedArchbishop of Santa Fe, New Mexico, USA

MicroData Summary for Rudolph Aloysius Gerken:
Archbishop Rudolph Aloysius Gerken (born , died ) Archbishop of Santa Fe

  • a priest for 25.7 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015