Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Rüegg

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1847Born
6 Nov 187023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
27 Mar 190658.4SelectedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
16 May 190658.5ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
10 Jun 190658.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
14 Oct 191365.9DiedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Rüegg (VIAF: 121671071)
Bishop Ferdinand Rüegg (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Gallen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGoldingen
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sankt Gallen, Diocese of Sankt Gallen

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,906, Number 35
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 628

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast