Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Gabriel Pinten

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Grand Rapids, Michigan

Titular Bishop of Sela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1867BornRockland, MI
1 Nov 189023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA
30 Nov 192154.1AppointedBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
3 May 192254.5Ordained BishopBishop of Superior, Wisconsin, USA
25 Jun 192658.7AppointedBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
1 Nov 194073.0ResignedBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
1 Nov 194073.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sela
6 Nov 194578.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gabriel Pinten:
Bishop Joseph Gabriel Pinten (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Grand Rapids

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015