Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerald (Jerry) Lee Vincke

Bishop of Salina, Kansas, USA

Apostolic Administrator of Dodge City, Kansas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1964 Born
12 Jun 199934.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lansing, Michigan, USA
13 Jun 201853.9AppointedBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA
22 Aug 201854.1Ordained BishopBishop of Salina, Kansas, USA
8 Feb 202156.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Dodge City, Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Gerald (Jerry) Lee Vincke
Bishop Gerald (Jerry) Lee Vincke (born ) Bishop of Salina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaginaw, Diocese of Saginaw, Michigan
Ordained PriestSt. Mary, Cathedral, Lansing, Diocese of Lansing, Michigan
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Salina, Diocese of Salina, Kansas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Salina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jun 2018
  • mn: CB, 13 Jun 2018
  • ob: CB, 15 Jun 2018
  • c2: CB, 18 Jul 2018
  • c34: CB, 20 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,839
  • aadm: CB, 8 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Feb 2021

Quantcast