Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Steven John Raica

Bishop of Birmingham, Alabama, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1952 Born
19 Nov 197725.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lansing, Michigan, USA
14 Oct 197825.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lansing, Michigan, USA
27 Jun 201461.6AppointedBishop of Gaylord, Michigan, USA
28 Aug 201461.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gaylord, Michigan, USA
25 Mar 202067.3AppointedBishop of Birmingham, Alabama, USA
23 Jun 202067.6InstalledBishop of Birmingham, Alabama, USA

MicroData Summary for Steven John Raica
Bishop Steven John Raica (born ) Bishop of Birmingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMunising
Ordained BishopSaint Mary, Our Lady of Mount Carmel, Cathedral, Gaylord, Diocese of Gaylord, Michigan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Birmingham.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2014
  • c01/od/ob: CB, 27 Jun 2014
  • c2+: CB, 29 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,276
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2020
  • i: CB, 25 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 22 May 2020

Quantcast