Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manoel de Almeida de Carvalho

Deceased

Bishop of Belém do Pará


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1747³BornVizeu, Portugal
8 Sep 177326.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 179043.3SelectedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
21 Jun 179043.4ConfirmedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
15 Aug 179043.6Ordained BishopBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
30 Jun 181871.4DiedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manoel de Almeida de Carvalho
Bishop Manoel de Almeida de Carvalho (born , died ) Bishop of Belém do Pará

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 22
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 118

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016