Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Mellino

Secretary of the Council of Cardinals

Titular Bishop of Cresima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1966 Born
29 Jun 199124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Alba (Pompea), Italy
27 Oct 201852.2AppointedAdjunct Secretary of the Council of Cardinals
27 Oct 201852.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cresima
15 Dec 201852.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cresima
15 Oct 202054.1AppointedSecretary of the Council of Cardinals

MicroData Summary for Marco Mellino (VIAF: 161708186)
Bishop Marco Mellino (born ) Secretary of Cardinals

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanale, Diocese of Alba (Pompea), Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Alba, Diocese of Alba (Pompea), Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Council of Cardinals.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2018
  • op/ob/c12+: CB, 27 Oct 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,953
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 15 Oct 2020

Quantcast