Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Eliseo Mojica Oliveros

Deceased

Bishop of Garagoa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1918BornSusacón
7 Jun 194122.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Feb 196748.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tunja, Colombia
20 Feb 196748.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Baliana
1 May 196748.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Baliana
4 Jun 197051.9AppointedBishop of Jericó, Colombia
26 Apr 197758.8AppointedBishop of Garagoa, Colombia
27 Dec 198971.5DiedBishop of Garagoa, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Juan Eliseo Mojica Oliveros:
Bishop Juan Eliseo Mojica Oliveros (born , died ) Bishop of Garagoa

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015