Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcelo Fabián Mazzitelli

Auxiliary Bishop of Mendoza, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Pauzera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1960 Born
11 Mar 198928.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of San Isidro, Argentina
15 Dec 198929.4Ordained PriestPriest of San Isidro, Argentina
10 Nov 201757.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mendoza, Argentina
10 Nov 201757.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Pauzera
29 Dec 201757.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pauzera

MicroData Summary for Marcelo Fabián Mazzitelli
Bishop Marcelo Fabián Mazzitelli (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mendoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained PriestCathedral, San Isidro, Diocese of San Isidro
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de los Dolores, Church, Mendoza, Archdiocese of Mendoza

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Mendoza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2017
  • od/op/c1/ob: CB, 10 Nov 2017
  • ob: CB, 29 Nov 2017
  • c2+: CB, 12 Dec 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,623

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast