Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petras Maželis

Deceased

Bishop of Telšiai, Lithuania

Prelate of Klaipeda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1894Born
15 Jun 192328.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 194955.2AppointedPrelate of Klaipeda, Lithuania
22 May 195560.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Telšiai, Lithuania
22 May 195560.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Celenderis
11 Sep 195560.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Celenderis
10 Nov 195965.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Telšiai, Lithuania
14 Feb 196469.3AppointedBishop of Telšiai, Lithuania
21 May 196671.6DiedBishop of Telšiai, Lithuania

MicroData Summary for Petras Maželis (VIAF: 8045154260798724480005)
Bishop Petras Maželis (born , died ) Bishop of Telšiai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMazeikiskis

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,955, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast