Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Purwinski

Bishop Emeritus of Kyiv-Zhytomyr, Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1934 Born
1960²25.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Riga, Latvia
13 Apr 196126.4Ordained PriestPriest of Riga, Latvia
16 Jan 199156.1AppointedBishop of Zytomir, Ukraine
4 Mar 199156.2Ordained BishopBishop of Zytomir, Ukraine
15 Jun 201176.5RetiredBishop of Kyiv-Zhytomyr, Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Purwinski
Bishop Jan Purwinski (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kyiv-Zhytomyr

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIlukste
Ordained BishopCathedral, Zytomir, Diocese of Zytomir

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kyiv-Zhytomyr.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2011
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,599
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,759
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • od/opd: CB, 24 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast