Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Vittorio Tommasí

Deceased

Bishop of Nueve de Julio, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1930Born
20 Nov 195525.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 198454.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
19 Nov 198454.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Equizetum
21 Dec 198454.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Equizetum
28 Aug 199161.0AppointedBishop of Nueve de Julio, Argentina
18 Oct 199161.2InstalledBishop of Nueve de Julio, Argentina
16 Sep 199868.1DiedBishop of Nueve de Julio, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Vittorio Tommasí
Bishop José Vittorio Tommasí (born , died ) Bishop of Nueve de Julio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlavarria

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast